Former Heads of the Office
01. Mr. Shahabuddin Azam - 10-05-84 to 14-01-85
02. Mr. AKM Nurunnabi - 02-0285 to 19-01-88
03. Mr. Saiduzzaman - 20-01-88 to 03-0-589
04. Mr. Md. Abdur Rahim (Acting) - 05-05-89 to 6-6-89
05. Mr. Md. Serazul Haque - 07-06-89 to 31-12-90
06. Mr. GN Nazmul Hossain Khan - 02-01-91 to 27-09-92
07. Mr. Sharif Sharafat Hussain (Acting) - 28-09-92 to 25-05-93
08. Mr. Md. Abduch Chalam - 14-06-93 to 05-12-95
09. Mr. Shamsuddin Ahmed (Acting) - 06-12-95 to 30-01-96
10. Mr. Zainal Abedin Mia 31-01-96 to 03-11-96
11. Mr. Shamsuddin Ahmed (Acting) - 04-11-96 to 15/02/97
12. Mr. Md. Nuruzzaman - 16-02-97 to 22-02-97
13. Mr. Shamsuddin Ahmed - 23-02-97 to 05-5-97
14. Mr. Afzal Hossain Miah (Acting) - 06-5-97 to 23-06-97
15. Mr. Md. Nuruzzaman - 24-06-97 to 03-11-98
16. Mr. Md. Altaf Hossain (Acting) - 04-11-98 to 22-11-98
17. Mr. Bhavesh Chandra Mitra - 23-11-98 to 20-4-02
18. Mr. Md. Tayabur Rahman (Acting) - 21-04-02 to 14-12-02
19. Mr. Md. Akram Hossain Sardar (Acting) - 14-12-02 to 17-12-02
20. Mr. Abul Hossain (Acting) - 18-12-02 to 03-04-03
21. Mr. Abul Bashar - 03-04-03 to 07-01-4
22. Mr. Abul Kalam Azad (Current Charge) - 07-01-04 07-03-05
23. Mr. Abul Kalam Azad (BCS – Cooperative) - 08-03-05 to 28-12-06
24 Mr. Qayyum Shikder (Acting)- 28-12-06 to 22-05-07
25. Mr. Md. Ziaul Haque (BCS-Cooperative) - 22-05-07 to 09-01-08
26. Mr. Qayyum Shikder (Acting) - 09-01-08 to 21-12-08
27. Mr. Mohammad Badrul Alam Mollah (BCS-Cooperative) - 21-12-08 to 30-11-10
28. Mr. Qayyum Shikder (Acting) - 30-11-10 to 07-02-11
29. Mr. Md. Abul Bashar (BCS-Cooperative) - 07-02-11 to 21-03-12
30. Mr. A. Qayyum Shikder (Acting) - 21-03-12 to 11-04-12
31. Mr. Sheikh Fazlul Karim (BCS-Cooperative) - 11-04-12 to 31-01-13
32. Mr. Qayyum Shikder (Acting) - 31-01-13 to 02-06-13
33. Mr. Sheikh Fazlul Karim (BCS-Cooperative) - 02-06-13 to 10-03-14
34. Mr. A. Qayyum Shikder (Acting) - 10-03-14 to 07-04-14
35. Mr. Md. Kamruzzaman (BCS-Cooperative) - 07-04-14 to 02-09-15
36. Mr. Qayyum Shikder (Acting) - 02-09-15 to 30-06-16
37. Mr. Fayekuzzaman (Acting) - 30-06-2016 to 07-01-2020
38. Mr. Fayekuzzaman (BCS-Cooperative) - 06-02-2020 to 31-05-2021
39. Mr. Sheikh Md. Nazrul Islam (Acting) - 01-06-2021 to 05-12-2021
40. Mr. Muhammad Tanim Rahman (BCS-Cooperative) - 12-12-2021 to 31-07-2022
Planning and Implementation: Cabinet Division, A2I, BCC, DoICT and BASIS